CT SB00190 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Public Hearing 02/07
Pending: Joint General Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-02 - Public Hearing 02/07
Pending: Joint General Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
To provide full disclosure of all transaction fees prior to an auction.
Title
An Act Concerning Auction House Transaction Fees.
Sponsors
Sen. John Kissel [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Public Hearing 01/31 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |
Connecticut State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.cga.ct.gov/asp/cgabillstatus/cgabillstatus.asp?selBillType=Bill&bill_num=SB00190&which_year=2017 |
Text | http://www.cga.ct.gov/2017/TOB/s/2017SB-00190-R00-SB.htm |