CT SB00188 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-25 - Senate Reconsidered, Veto Sustained
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

To establish the State Oversight Council on Children and Families in place of the State Advisory Council on Children and Families, and require the State Oversight Council on Children and Families to report annually to the joint standing committees of the General Assembly having cognizance of matters relating to appropriations and children.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Establishing The State Oversight Council On Children And Families.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 395 REPASS (Y: 16 N: 15 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 289 AS AMENDED (Y: 137 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 203 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-25SenateSenate Reconsidered, Veto Sustained
2018-06-25SenateSenate Reconsidered
2018-06-13SenateVetoed by the Governor
2018-05-29SenateTransmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor
2018-05-29SenateTransmitted to the Secretary of State
2018-05-24SenatePublic Act 18-140
2018-05-09SenateIn Concurrence
2018-05-09SenateHouse Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-09SenateHouse Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-06SenateHouse Calendar Number 533
2018-05-06SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
2018-05-04SenateSenate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
2018-05-04SenateSenate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3689
2018-03-28SenateFile Number 92
2018-03-28SenateSenate Calendar Number 76
2018-03-28SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-03-28SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-22SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-15SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-15SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2018-02-23SenatePublic Hearing 02/27
2018-02-22SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Children

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback