CT SB00182 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-13 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a first-time homebuyer savings account and tax deduction.
Title
An Act Establishing A First-time Homebuyer Savings Account And Tax Deduction.
Sponsors
House Banking Committee | Sen. Kevin Kelly [R] | Rep. Tom Delnicki [R] | Rep. Gary Turco [D] |
Sen. Eric Berthel [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Joint - BA Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |
2022-03-21 | Senate | File Number 55 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 77 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/01 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Banking |