CT SB00182 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - House Calendar Number 566
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 7 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - House Calendar Number 566
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require persons representing property owners or lessors in certain appeals concerning real property assessments to be either attorneys or certified or provisionally licensed real estate appraisers and to prohibit certified or provisionally licensed real estate appraisers from entering into contingency fee agreements in such appeals.
Title
An Act Concerning Municipal Tax Appeals And Contingency Agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 244 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 5590 (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 245 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 245 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 29 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | House Calendar Number 566 |
2018-05-08 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-07 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5590 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | File Number 462 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 295 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/11/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |