CT SB00181 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-21 - Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To include energy produced from upgrades at existing hydropower plants in the definition of Class I renewable energy sources.
Title
An Act Concerning Renewable Energy Sources.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Removed from the Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-14 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-03-31 | File Number 231 | |
2010-03-31 | Senate Calendar Number 158 | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-03-31 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-25 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-16 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-18 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |
2010-02-17 | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |