CT SB00177 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - House Calendar Number 501
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - House Calendar Number 501
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the chairperson of the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority to conduct a study regarding grid resilience.
Title
An Act Concerning Grid Resilience.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 204 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Calendar Number 501 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5178 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | File Number 349 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 247 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |