CT SB00175 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To expand eligibility for the Alzheimer's disease respite care program and provide funding to allow more senior citizens to age in place at home.
Title
An Act Expanding Eligibility For The Alzheimer's Disease Respite Care Program And Supporting Aging In Place.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-10 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |