CT SB00170 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the recommendations of the Department of Mental Health and Addiction Services regarding streamlining reports.
Title
An Act Concerning The Department Of Mental Health And Addiction Services' Recommendations Regarding Streamlining Reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-08 - House - House Roll Call Vote 266 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 77 ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 79 ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 77 ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 79 ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Public Act 18-39 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-08 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-08 | Senate | House Passed |
2018-04-19 | Senate | House Calendar Number 407 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-04-18 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2018-03-20 | Senate | File Number 22 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 53 |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/19/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/28 |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |