CT SB00164 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-18 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To expand workers' compensation coverage in certain situations that result in mental or emotional impairment.
Title
An Act Concerning Workers' Compensation Benefits For Certain Mental Or Emotional Impairments, Mental Health Care For Police Officers And Wellness Training For Police Officers, Parole Officers And Firefighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - House - House Roll Call Vote 257 AS AMENDED (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 251 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,B,D (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 251 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A,B,D (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 36 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-18 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-06 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-06 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-05 | House | Public Act 19-17 |
2019-05-31 | House | In Concurrence |
2019-05-31 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B,D |
2019-05-31 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule D |
2019-05-31 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2019-05-31 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2019-05-31 | House | Rules Suspended |
2019-05-30 | House | House Calendar Number 683 |
2019-05-30 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-30 | House | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B,D |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule D 10183 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule C 10047 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Matter Pass Retained |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule C 10047 |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 9712 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-05-15 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8127 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | File Number 362 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 202 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/26 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |