CT SB00164 | 2018 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-18 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To raise the legal age to purchase tobacco to twenty-one.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Raising The Legal Age To Purchase Tobacco To Twenty-one.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-26 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 22 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-18SenateReferred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
2018-04-10SenateFile Number 387
2018-04-10SenateSenate Calendar Number 218
2018-04-10SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2018-04-10SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-04-03SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/09/18 5:00 PM
2018-03-27SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2018-03-26SenateJoint Favorable
2018-03-16SenatePublic Hearing 03/20
2018-02-16SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Public Health

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback