CT SB00160 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To protect the health of elderly residents by ensuring that smoking is not allowed in nursing home facilities and state or federally subsidized housing designated for elderly persons.
Title
An Act Concerning Smoking In Nursing Homes, Assisted Living Facilities And Other Housing For The Elderly.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |