CT SB00141 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-12 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To establish a task force to study cancer relief benefits for firefighters.
Title
An Act Establishing A Task Force To Study Cancer Relief Benefits For Firefighters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 380 AS AMENDED (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 224 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 224 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Joint - LAB Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-12 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Special Act 21-35 |
2021-06-09 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-06-09 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 522 |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8279 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | File Number 213 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 167 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/21 5:00 PM |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |