CT SB00137 | 2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To expand the data privacy breach notification statute to protect consumers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Data Privacy Breaches.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2020-03-10SenateJoint Favorable Substitute
2020-02-20SenatePublic Hearing 02/25
2020-02-19SenateReferred to Joint Committee on General Law

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback