CT SB00134 | 2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - House Calendar Number 318
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-11 - House Calendar Number 318
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To make minor and technical revisions to statutes concerning consumer protection.
Title
An Act Concerning The Legislative Commissioners' Recommendations For Minor And Technical Revisions To Statutes Concerning Consumer Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 63 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Joint - GL Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | House | House Calendar Number 318 |
2024-04-11 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2024-03-21 | Senate | File Number 70 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 70 |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/24 5:00 PM |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/20 |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |