CT SB00129 | 2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-27 - Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To establish an Office of Condominium Ombudsman within the Department of Consumer Protection.
Title
An Act Establishing An Office Of Condominium Ombudsman.
Sponsors
House General Law Committee | Rep. Demetrios Giannaros [D] | Rep. Auden Grogins [D] | Rep. Michael Lawlor [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-27 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-27 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-27 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-21 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2010-04-16 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-04-16 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2010-04-15 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-15 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-04-14 | Joint Favorable | |
2010-04-08 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2010-03-25 | File Number 123 | |
2010-03-25 | Senate Calendar Number 102 | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2010-03-25 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-19 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/24/10 5:00 PM | |
2010-03-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2010-03-16 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2010-02-11 | Public Hearing 02/16 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |