CT SB00124 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - File Number 257
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - File Number 257
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Commissioner of Children and Families to conduct a study to determine whether policy and procedural changes in the Department of Children and Families may increase the effectiveness of services provided to children.
Title
An Act Concerning Children's Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | File Number 257 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 211 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |