CT SB00123 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - File Number 256
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - File Number 256
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To permit victims of kidnapping and human trafficking and children who are the subject of petitions to terminate parental rights granted by the court to participate in the address confidentiality program established in the office of the Secretary of the State.
Title
An Act Expanding Eligibility For The Address Confidentiality Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | File Number 256 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 210 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |