CT SB00116 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-19 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-05-19 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To increase the property tax exemption for disabled veterans.
Title
An Act Increasing Property Tax Exemptions For Disabled Veterans And Members Of The Armed Forces.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-19 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-05-06 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development |
2015-03-23 | Senate | File Number 145 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 157 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/15 10:00 AM |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/17 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2015-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Veterans' Affairs |