CT SB00114 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To permit members of municipal zoning commissions and municipal boards of appeals to serve as alternate members of municipal planning commissions.
Title
An Act Concerning Alternate Members Of Municipal Planning Commissions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |