CT SB00112 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the seller of real property on which a dam or similar structure is located to disclose the existence of such dam or similar structure on a residential condition report.
Title
An Act Concerning The Disclosure Of Dams And Similar Structures By Sellers Of Real Property.
Sponsors
House Planning and Development Committee | Rep. John Hampton [D] | Sen. Catherine Osten [D] | Rep. Joshua Elliott [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Joint - PD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |