CT SB00104 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To limit exposure to pesticides by prohibiting the use of residential automatic pesticide misting systems.
Title
An Act Prohibiting The Use Of Residential Automatic Pesticide Misting Systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-09 - House - House Roll Call Vote 311 AS AMENDED (Y: 128 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 239 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 239 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | House | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-23 | House | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-22 | House | Public Act 18-84 |
2018-05-09 | House | In Concurrence |
2018-05-09 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-09 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-07 | House | House Calendar Number 559 |
2018-05-07 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-07 | House | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 |
2018-05-07 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4504 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | File Number 5 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 38 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/12/18 5:00 PM |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/23 |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |