CT SB00100 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To provide municipalities with needed resources to test for and remediate PFAS contamination on town-owned properties and to assist residential homeowners impacted by such contamination.
Title
An Act Establishing An Account In The General Fund To Provide Grants To Towns That Need Pfas Testing And Remediation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 261 AS AMENDED (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 241 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 241 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-03 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Public Act 23-74 |
2023-06-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2023-06-02 | House | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2023-06-02 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B |
2023-06-02 | House | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2023-05-24 | House | House Calendar Number 576 |
2023-05-24 | House | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2023-05-23 | House | On Consent Calendar |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B |
2023-05-23 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8495 |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-05-09 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-05-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6512 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | File Number 140 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 105 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/20/23 5:00 PM |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/15 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |