CT SB00100 | 2021 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Public Hearing 03/08
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Public Hearing 03/08
Pending: Joint Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To extend various health and legal protections to persons with intersex conditions.
Title
An Act Concerning Intersex Persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - Joint - PH Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |