CT SB00097 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - File Number 40
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - File Number 40
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated to study private equity investment in the state.
Title
An Act Concerning Connecticut Innovations, Incorporated, And A Study Of Private Equity Investment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-08 - Joint - CE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | File Number 40 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 70 |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/22 12:00 PM |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |