CT SB00095 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-06 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To enhance the state's shellfish restoration program through certain contracting authority and to reconstitute the Connecticut Seafood Council.
Title
An Act Concerning Connecticut's Shellfish Restoration Program And The Connecticut Seafood Advisory Council.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-28 - Joint - ENV Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |