CT SB00093 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To create financing opportunities for zero-emission vehicle infrastructure and resiliency measures.
Title
An Act Concerning The Commercial Property Assessed Clean Energy Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 134 (Y: 119 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 131 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 131 (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Public Act 22-6 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Passed |
2022-04-21 | Senate | House Calendar Number 417 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | File Number 345 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 243 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/05/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/24 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |