CT SB00093 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To make minor revisions to the statutes of the Department of Children and Families and to consolidate the reporting requirements of the department.
Title
An Act Concerning Minor Changes To The Statutes Of The Department Of Children And Families.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - KID Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |