CT SB00081 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-06 - Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To reduce the financial burden on spouses of nursing home residents whose care is being funded under the Medicaid program.
Title
An Act Permitting The Community Spouse Of An Institutionalized Medicaid Recipient To Retain The Maximum Amount Of Allowable Assets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - Joint - AGE Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-06 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Appropriations |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Aging |