CT SB00081 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Vote to Draft
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To prevent private occupational schools that require students to waive certain rights, as a condition of enrollment, from receiving a certificate of authorization or public funds from the Office of Higher Education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Making Certain Private Occupational Schools Ineligible For A Certificate Of Authorization And Public Funds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenateVote to Draft
2019-02-01SenatePublic Hearing 02/05
2019-01-24SenateReserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing
2019-01-17SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback