CT SB00078 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-30-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-30-1)
Status: Passed on May 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-06 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To allow graduates from certain higher education institutions to participate in the Learn Here, Live Here program and require payments from the Department of Economic and Community Development in accordance with the program.
Title
An Act Concerning The Learn Here, Live Here Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-07 - House - House Roll Call Vote 270 AS AMENDED (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 302 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 233 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 4408 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-04 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 302 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 233 ADOPT SENATE AMD A LCO 4408 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-06 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-22 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-17 | Public Act 12-75 | |
2012-05-07 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-07 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-07 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-06 | House Calendar Number 519 | |
2012-05-06 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-05-04 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-05-04 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-03 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-05-03 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2012-05-03 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-05-03 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-05-03 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-05-02 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |
2012-05-02 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4408 | |
2012-04-24 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-24 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-24 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-24 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-23 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-19 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2012-04-18 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-18 | No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |
2012-04-17 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-17 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-17 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-11 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |
2012-03-27 | File Number 117 | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Calendar Number 118 | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-03-27 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-20 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/26/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-15 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-02-17 | Public Hearing 02/21 | |
2012-02-16 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |