CT SB00067 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-08 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To make technical corrections to the banking statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Revisions To The Banking Statutes.
Sponsors
House Banks Committee | Sen. Edwin Gomes [D] | Sen. Timothy Larson [D] | Sen. Anthony Musto [D] |
Rep. Christopher Wright [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-25 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 183 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-08 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-23 | Public Act 12-96 | |
2012-05-08 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-08 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-05-08 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-08 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-27 | House Calendar Number 444 | |
2012-04-27 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-25 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-25 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3908 | |
2012-04-17 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-04-17 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2012-04-16 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-04-16 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-04-10 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |
2012-03-29 | File Number 156 | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Calendar Number 162 | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-03-29 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-23 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/12 5:00 PM | |
2012-03-16 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-03-15 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |
2012-03-01 | Public Hearing 03/06 | |
2012-02-15 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |