CT SB00063 | 2019 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - File Number 853
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

To permit a person with a disability to enter into a supported decision-making agreement with another person.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning The Use Of A Supported Decision-making Agreement By A Person With A Disability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateFile Number 853
2019-04-30SenateSenate Calendar Number 449
2019-04-30SenateFavorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2019-04-30SenateReported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-23SenateReferred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 5:00 PM
2019-04-12SenateFiled with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2019-04-10SenateJoint Favorable
2019-03-28SenatePublic Hearing 04/01
2019-03-21SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
2019-03-20SenateDrafted by Committee
2019-01-23SenateVote to Draft
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Joint Committee on Judiciary

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback