CT SB00060 | 2011 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-07 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-07 - Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require certain staffing levels within the Department of Environmental Protection that will enable the agency to improve critical services to the regulated community and the citizens of this state.
Title
An Act Concerning The Enforcement And Permitting Duties Of The Department Of Environmental Protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-07 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |
2011-03-21 | File Number 115 | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Calendar Number 109 | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2011-03-21 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/21/11 10:00 AM | |
2011-03-10 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2011-03-09 | Joint Favorable | |
2011-01-27 | Public Hearing 01/31 | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment | |
2011-01-25 | Drafted by Committee | |
2011-01-10 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |