CT SB00058 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-5-1)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit the use of gay and transgender panic as a criminal defense.
Title
An Act Concerning Gay And Transgender Panic Defense.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - House - House Roll Call Vote 287 (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 124 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 124 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Public Act 19-27 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | House Passed |
2019-05-13 | Senate | House Calendar Number 559 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2019-05-09 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2019-04-29 | Senate | File Number 829 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 430 |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/29/19 10:00 AM |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/29 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |