CT SB00040 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-01 - House Calendar Number 541
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-01 - House Calendar Number 541
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To restrict the circumstances under which an employer may require an employee or job applicant to consent to a credit report by removing a provision allowing employers to require a credit report from an employee or job applicant who has access to nonfinancial assets valued at two thousand five dollars or more.
Title
An Act Concerning Employer Inquiries About An Employee's Or Prospective Employee's Credit History.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 250 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 254 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-29 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 254 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-01 | Senate | House Calendar Number 541 |
2016-05-01 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5541 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-06 | Senate | No New File by Committee on General Law |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law |
2016-03-03 | Senate | File Number 4 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 59 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/02/16 5:00 PM |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/16 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |