CT SB00038 | 2019 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - File Number 359
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - File Number 359
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To reduce the time frame for urgent care adverse determination review requests and expedited external reviews from seventy-two to forty-eight hours.
Title
An Act Reducing The Time Frame For Urgent Care Adverse Determination Review Requests And Expedited External Reviews.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Joint - INS Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | File Number 359 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 191 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/02/19 5:00 PM |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/07 |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |