CT SB00034 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Public Hearing 03/18
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Public Hearing 03/18
Pending: Joint Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To expand the Covered Connecticut program to benefit the state's middle class.
Title
An Act Concerning Funding For The Covered Connecticut Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - Joint - APP Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/18 |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations |