CT SB00029 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-25 - Public Hearing 03/03
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-25 - Public Hearing 03/03
Pending: Joint Finance, Revenue and Bonding Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To increase the applicable percentage of the earned income tax credit from thirty and one-half per cent to forty-one and one-half per cent for taxable years commencing on or after January 1, 2022.
Title
An Act Concerning The Earned Income Tax Credit.
Sponsors
Sen. Martin Looney [D] | Rep. Michael Winkler [D] | Rep. David Michel [D] | Rep. Brandon Chafee [D] |
Rep. Brian Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/03 |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |