CT SB00026 | 2017 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To ensure that swatting is treated as a class D felony offense and that the offender may be held responsible for financial restitution to a municipality or state agency.
Title
An Act Concerning Swatting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - House Roll Call Vote 358 CONSENT CALENDAR (Y: 150 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 83 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 83 PASS (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-10 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 33 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Public Act 17-72 |
2017-06-06 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2017-06-06 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2017-06-06 | Senate | House Passed |
2017-05-05 | Senate | House Calendar Number 464 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Passed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | File Number 267 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 158 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/27/17 5:00 PM |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/27 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |