CT SB00026 | 2012 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - File Number 516
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act Concerning Deadlines For Consensus Revenue Estimates.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-18 File Number 516
2012-04-18 Senate Calendar Number 356
2012-04-18 Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
2012-04-18 Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-04-12 Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/17/12 5:00 PM
2012-04-04 Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
2012-04-03 Joint Favorable Substitute
2012-03-07 Public Hearing 03/12
2012-02-09 Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding

Connecticut State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback