CT SB00024 | 2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-26 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To exempt academic programs of certain independent institutions of higher education from approval by the Office of Higher Education.
Title
An Act Concerning Program Approval For Independent Institutions Of Higher Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - House - House Roll Call Vote 225 AS AMENDED (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 183 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 187 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 183 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 187 PASS AS AMENDED BY SEN A (Y: 35 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2016-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Public Act 16-36 |
2016-05-02 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2016-05-02 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-05-02 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-29 | Senate | House Calendar Number 492 |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4974 |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-04-19 | Senate | No New File by Committee on Appropriations |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-03-09 | Senate | File Number 13 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 64 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/08/16 5:00 PM |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/18 |
2016-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |