CT SB00020 | 2023 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-03 - File Number 373
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-03 - File Number 373
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority to review any proposed acquisition or merger of a cable or telecommunications provider doing business in this state, and provide that no such provider may be the subject of such an acquisition or merger without having obtained prior approval from the Public Utilities Regulatory Authority.
Title
An Act Concerning Acquisitions And Mergers Of Cable And Telecommunications Providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable) (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Vote to Draft) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-19 - Joint - ET Vote Tally Sheet (Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-03 | Senate | File Number 373 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 209 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/03/23 12:00 PM |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/21 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Reserved for Subject Matter Public Hearing |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Energy and Technology |