CT SB00019 | 2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To (1) establish a Council on Sexual Misconduct Climate Survey to create a sexual misconduct climate survey for use by institutions of higher education in the state, and (2) protect students who report being a victim or witness of sexual assault, stalking or violence from disciplinary action by the institution of higher education.
Title
An Act Concerning Sexual Misconduct On College Campuses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/13 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |