CT SB00018 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
To make various revisions to the higher education statutes.
Title
An Act Concerning Various Revisions To The Higher Education Statutes.
Sponsors
House Higher Education and Employment Advancement Committee | Rep. Travis Simms [D] | Rep. Kenneth Gucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - House - House Roll Call Vote 135 AS AMENDED (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 130 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-19 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 130 (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Public Act 22-16 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-28 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 455 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4872 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | File Number 9 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 41 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/22 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |