CT SB00017 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - House Calendar Number 437
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - House Calendar Number 437
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To prohibit an institution of higher education from withholding a student's transcript for failure to pay a debt owed to the institution.
Title
An Act Prohibiting An Institution Of Higher Education From Withholding Transcripts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 151 (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Joint - HED Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | Senate | House Calendar Number 437 |
2022-04-22 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4848 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | File Number 209 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 165 |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/22 5:00 PM |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/08 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |