CT SB00015 | 2015 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-27 - Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-27 - Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To require health insurance coverage for the diagnosis and treatment of pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorder associated with streptococcal infections.
Title
An Act Requiring Health Insurance Coverage For Pediatric Autoimmune Neuropsychiatric Disorder Associated With Streptococcal Infections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Senate | Senate Recommitted to Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-02-20 | Senate | File Number 12 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 66 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 02/19/15 5:00 PM |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Joint Favorable |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 02/03 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Drafted by Committee |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Vote to Draft |
2015-01-07 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |