CT SB00013 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-14 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Concerning The Fair Treatment Of Incarcerated Persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - House - House Roll Call Vote 197 AS AMENDED (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 133 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 145 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 133 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 145 ADOPT (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-02 - Joint - JUD Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted by Secretary of the State to Governor |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to the Secretary of State |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Public Act 18-4 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | In Concurrence |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Rules Suspended |
2018-05-03 | Senate | House Calendar Number 489 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House |
2018-05-01 | Senate | On Consent Calendar |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 4753 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | File Number 603 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 354 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/18 5:00 PM |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/28 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |