CT SB00012 | 2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 609
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-25 - File Number 609
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Authorizing And Adjusting Bonds Of The State For Capital Improvements And Other Purposes And Concerning The Connecticut Baby Bond Trust Program And Grants For Certain Law Enforcement Equipment And Homelessness Prevention And Response.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet-A (Y: 24 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Joint Favorable Substitute) (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Senate | File Number 609 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 437 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/25/22 12:00 PM |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/30 |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |