CT SB00012 | 2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - File Number 625
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - File Number 625
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
To implement the Governor's budget recommendations.
Title
An Act Authorizing And Adjusting Bonds Of The State For Capital Improvements And Other Purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Joint - FIN Vote Tally Sheet (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Senate | File Number 625 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Calendar Number 386 |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/23/18 10:00 AM |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Joint Favorable Substitute |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Public Hearing 03/02 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Joint Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding |