CT SB00012 | 2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-31 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
To clarify the criteria for insurance coverage of breast magnetic resonance imaging.
Title
An Act Concerning Guidelines For Health Insurance Coverage For Colorectal Cancer Screening.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-05 - House - House Roll Call Vote 249 AS AMENDED (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 191 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-26 - Senate - Senate Roll Call Vote 191 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-31 | Signed by the Governor | |
2012-05-18 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |
2012-05-15 | Public Act 12-61 | |
2012-05-05 | In Concurrence | |
2012-05-05 | House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-05-05 | House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-28 | House Calendar Number 453 | |
2012-04-28 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |
2012-04-26 | On Consent Calendar | |
2012-04-26 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |
2012-04-26 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 3956 | |
2012-03-05 | File Number 6 | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Calendar Number 51 | |
2012-03-05 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |
2012-03-05 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/05/12 10:00 AM | |
2012-02-21 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |
2012-02-21 | Joint Favorable | |
2012-02-10 | Public Hearing 02/16 | |
2012-02-08 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |